Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2019 at 01:10:06 (UTC).

AVALOS, MAX VS GUATEMALTECA BAKERY INC

Case Summary

On 09/22/2015 AVALOS, MAX filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GUATEMALTECA BAKERY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1741

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVALOS MAX

Defendants

GUATEMALTECA BAKERY INC

GKR RESTAURANTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DANIEL DEMBICER

Defendant Attorneys

ACOSTA, OSCAR A.

ACOSTA OSCAR A.

 

Court Documents

Summons

9/22/2015: Summons

Complaint - Other Premise Liability

9/22/2015: Complaint - Other Premise Liability

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Other - (name extension) - Proof Of Service Of Summons

10/7/2015: Other - (name extension) - Proof Of Service Of Summons

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/19/2015: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

1/25/2016: (name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

(name extension) - DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

2/11/2016: (name extension) - DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

8/5/2016: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Other - (name extension) - Minute Order

6/21/2017: Other - (name extension) - Minute Order

Minute Order - (OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File De...)

9/26/2017: Minute Order - (OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File De...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/14/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause re: re: Default/Judgment)

3/14/2018: Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause re: re: Default/Judgment)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/18/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment

8/7/2018: Judgment

Other - (name extension) - TRIAL BRIEF

8/7/2018: Other - (name extension) - TRIAL BRIEF

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

8/7/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

8/7/2018: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Declaration (name extension) - IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT

8/7/2018: Declaration (name extension) - IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2018
  • Updated -- Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740: Location changed from Department 77 to Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Default Judgment/Dismissal scheduled for 09/14/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/24/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: MAX AVALOS (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 2-100 GUATEMALTECA BAKERY INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • On the Complaint filed by AVALOS, MAX on 09/22/2015, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to GUATEMALTECA BAKERY INC, Does 2-100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff AVALOS, MAX against Defendant GKR RESTAURANTS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION on the Complaint filed by AVALOS, MAX on 09/22/2015 for damages of $7,500.00 for a total of $7,500.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: MAX AVALOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: MAX AVALOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Declaration IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT; Filed by: MAX AVALOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2015
  • A/C - MOTION FILING REASON: OTHERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED FOR FICTITIOUS N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Other - Proof Of Service Of Summons; Filed by: MAX AVALOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 03/22/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • OSC SET 09/24/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED - OTHER PREMISE LIABILITY Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MAX AVALOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUATEMALTECA BAKERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORTION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ACOSTA OSCAR A.