This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2019 at 01:24:13 (UTC).

AVALON RISK MANAGEMENT INSURAN VS CAVALIER CLOSEOUTS INC.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2015 AVALON RISK MANAGEMENT INSURAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CAVALIER CLOSEOUTS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL P RAMIREZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6218

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL P RAMIREZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVALON RISK MANAGEMENT INSURANCE AGENCY LLC

Defendants

CAVALIER CLOSEOUTS

CAVALIER CLOSEOUTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF GARY A. BEMIS - GARY A. BEMIS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GARY A. BEMIS

BEMIS GARY A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • Order case file destroyed per section(s) 71008 and/or 68152 of the Government Code. Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (CAVALIER CLOSEOUTS INC.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 1.50 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # NOR437743012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CAVALIER CLOSEOUTS INC.) SERVED EYAL DAHAN BY SUBSERVING DAVID DOE ON 12/08/15 . COSTS OF $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 10/19/18 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY DANIEL P RAMIREZ, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455965026. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALIER CLOSEOUTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA APPAREL LIQUIDATORS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEMIS, GARY A