This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/30/2021 at 06:00:25 (UTC).

AVA INC. VS ROLAND ANDRADE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 AVA INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROLAND ANDRADE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3807

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVA INC. DBA RELIABLE ROOFING A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

ANDRADE ROLAND

ANDRADE EVELYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAGOPIAN SHANT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

9/30/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

10/1/2020: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF SHANT H. HAGOPIAN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

9/8/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF SHANT H. HAGOPIAN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application for Immediate Stay of Writ of Execution and Enforcement of Judgment Pending Motion to Set Aside Default and Judgment by Clerk

4/2/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application for Immediate Stay of Writ of Execution and Enforcement of Judgment Pending Motion to Set Aside Default and Judgment by Clerk

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order RE: Advancement and Continuance of Hearing on Mot...)

5/8/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order RE: Advancement and Continuance of Hearing on Mot...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order- Matter is not called for a hearing.)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order- Matter is not called for a hearing.)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order- Matter is not called for a hearing.) of 04/15/2020

4/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order- Matter is not called for a hearing.) of 04/15/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings; Ex Parte Application by defendants Rol...)

4/3/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings; Ex Parte Application by defendants Rol...)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

3/5/2020: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

3/6/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

1/21/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

1/13/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

1/6/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

1/6/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

1/6/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/7/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: AVA INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Roland Andrade (Defendant); Evelyn Andrade (Defendant); Costs: 80.00; Interest: 1882.78; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 09/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment: Filed By: Roland Andrade (Defendant),Evelyn Andrade (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date: 09/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Proposed Order Denying Motion to Set Aside Default: Filed By: AVA INC. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: AVA INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) scheduled for 09/30/2020 at 10:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 09/30/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Filed By: AVA INC. (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 09/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketOpposition TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; Filed by: AVA INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDeclaration OF VAHE KALASHYAN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Filed by: AVA INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AVA INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Roland Andrade (Defendant); Service Date: 11/19/2019; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AVA INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Evelyn Andrade (Defendant); Service Date: 11/19/2019; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AVA INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Roland Andrade (Defendant); Evelyn Andrade (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AVA INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Roland Andrade (Defendant); Evelyn Andrade (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AVA INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Roland Andrade (Defendant); Evelyn Andrade (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVA INC. DBA RELIABLE ROOFING is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAGOPIAN SHANT