This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 00:42:09 (UTC).

AUTUM MAHABIR VS ALLIANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Case Summary

On 05/02/2018 AUTUM MAHABIR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLIANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2130

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAHABIR AUTUM

Cypress, CA 90630

Defendant

ALLIANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

5/2/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/10/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/14/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - Notice Small Claims Reassignment

12/27/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice Small Claims Reassignment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

12/27/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL Autum Mahabir (Plaintiff)

1/7/2019: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL Autum Mahabir (Plaintiff)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/07/2019

3/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/07/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/7/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (via fax)

5/2/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (via fax)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (via fax), Request to Waive Court Fees (via fax), Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]

5/2/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (via fax), Request to Waive Court Fees (via fax), Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/3/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Autum Mahabir on 05/02/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/07/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 03/07/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • RETURNED MAIL Autum Mahabir (Plaintiff); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Autum Mahabir (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Notice Small Claims Reassignment; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Autum Mahabir (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice Small Claims Reassignment]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Updated -- 03/07/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/14/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Autum Mahabir (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (via fax): Name Extension: (via fax)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees (via fax): Name Extension: (via fax); Result Date changed from 05/03/2018 to 05/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Autum Mahabir (Plaintiff); As to: Alliance Property Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Autum Mahabir (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (via fax), Request to Waive Court Fees (via fax), Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant