This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2016 at 20:14:06 (UTC).

AUSTIN, VERDA VS. AUSTIN, PHILIP

Case Summary

On 08/16/2013 AUSTIN, VERDA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against AUSTIN, PHILIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY NEWMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6916

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NANCY NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUSTIN VERDA AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

AUSTIN PHILIP AN INDIVIDUAL

AUSTIN PHILLIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL T. CHULAK & ASSOC., A LAW CORP. - F. STEPHEN JONES ESQ

Attorney at MICHAEL T. CHULAK & ASSOC., A LAW CORP.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2016
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 07/13/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (AUSTIN, VERDA) AN INDIVIDUAL FOR REJECTION OF WRIT: AFTER CAREFULLY REVIEWING YOUR CASE FILE; THE JUDGMENT FILED ON 10/08/13 DID NOT INCLUDE ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS. PLEASE REVISE AND RESUBMIT... SUBMITTED ON 10/16/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO F. STEPHEN JONES, ESQ. FOR REJECTION OF WRIT OF POSSESSION: THERE IS NO (APPLACTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION, POSSESSION OR SALE) . FORM (CIV 096 REV 01/07). THANK YOU. SUBMITTED ON 10/04/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (AUSTIN, PHILIP) AN INDIVIDUAL ON 10/03/13 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 00.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 10/08/13 . FOR (AUSTIN, VERDA) AN INDIVIDUAL . AGAINST (AUSTIN, PHILIP) AN INDIVIDUAL . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 19541 LORNE STREET RESEDA, CA 91335 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (AUSTIN, PHILLIP) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (AUSTIN, PHILIP) AN INDIVIDUAL . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (AUSTIN, VERDA) AN INDIVIDUAL FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IF YOU INCLUDE ALL UNNAMED TENANTS IN YOUR JUDGMENT YOU MUST DEFAULT AND SERVE THEM. #5 NOT COMPLETE. SUBMITTED ON 09/24/13

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2013
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT RECEIVED AS TO (AUSTIN, VERDA) AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS,COMPLAINT,CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET,NOTICE OF OSC & CASE ASSIGNMENT,ADDENDUM,STATEMENT OF LOCATION,PREJUDGMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (AUSTIN, PHILIP) AN INDIVIDUAL . COSTS OF $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER RETURNED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER RETURNED AS TO (AUSTIN, PHILIP) AN INDIVIDUAL DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM405596038.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 02/13/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . 081613

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE NANCY NEWMAN .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL T. CHULAK & ASSOC., A LAW CORP. - F. STEPHEN JONES ESQ