Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 16:31:11 (UTC).

AURORA BALDIZON VS JUAN GARCIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/14/2017 AURORA BALDIZON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JUAN GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7889

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BALDIZON AURORA

Los Angeles, CA 90061

Defendants

GARCIA JUAN

Lynwood, CA 90262

MARTINEZ GABRIELA

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/27/2018: Unknown

EXHIBIT RECEIPT

1/3/2018: EXHIBIT RECEIPT

Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/26/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/26/2017: Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/26/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Unknown

12/26/2017: Unknown

(Ruling on Submitted Matter)

12/26/2017: (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

(Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

12/22/2017: (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Unknown

11/9/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/9/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/9/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

10/18/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

10/18/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

10/18/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

(VIA FAX)

9/21/2017: (VIA FAX)

Unknown

9/19/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/14/2017: Unknown

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Other - EXHIBIT RECEIPT; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/26/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Court orders judgment after trial de novo entered for Plaintiff AURORA BALDIZON against Defendant JUAN GARCIA on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by AURORA BALDIZON on 08/14/2017 for the principal amount of $4,250.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $4,365.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.; Other: Defendant Gabriela Martinez was previously dismissed on 08/14/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by AURORA BALDIZON on 08/14/2017, judgment entered on 10/18/2017 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by AURORA BALDIZON on 08/14/2017, judgment entered on 10/18/2017 as to JUAN GARCIA is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 12/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 12/22/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 10/18/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff AURORA BALDIZON against Defendant JUAN GARCIA on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by AURORA BALDIZON on 08/14/2017 for the principal amount of $6,000.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $6,115.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: AURORA BALDIZON (Plaintiff); As to: GABRIELA MARTINEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Updated -- Request for Dismissal (VIA FAX): Name Extension: (VIA FAX)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by AURORA BALDIZON on 08/14/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to GABRIELA MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: JUAN GARCIA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/14/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: AURORA BALDIZON (Plaintiff); As to: JUAN GARCIA (Defendant); GABRIELA MARTINEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less