This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2020 at 01:26:10 (UTC).

ASPIRE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS ROXANNA RODRIGUEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 ASPIRE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ROXANNA RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4247

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASPIRE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ ROXANNA

RODRIGUEZ ANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES TODD F.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/31/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Order (name extension) - Order FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION AND ENTER DISMISSAL

9/3/2020: Order (name extension) - Order FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION AND ENTER DISMISSAL

Notice (name extension) - Notice ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

9/4/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Notice (name extension) - Notice CONTINUANCE MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR ADMISSIONS

9/4/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice CONTINUANCE MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR ADMISSIONS

Request (name extension) - Request to take Motions off Calendar

9/24/2020: Request (name extension) - Request to take Motions off Calendar

Order (name extension) - Order FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION AND ENTER DISMISSAL

8/17/2020: Order (name extension) - Order FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION AND ENTER DISMISSAL

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...)

8/18/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...) of 08/18/2020

8/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...) of 08/18/2020

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

4/14/2020: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

4/14/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/25/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer - Answer

6/11/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/20/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/20/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/1/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/1/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/1/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketRequest to take Motions off Calendar; Filed by: Aspire General Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION AND ENTER DISMISSAL: Filed By: Aspire General Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Aspire General Insurance Company, a corporation on 05/01/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Roxanna Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/25/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 10/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 10/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNotice CONTINUANCE MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR ADMISSIONS; Filed by: Aspire General Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Roxanna Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNotice ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING; Filed by: Aspire General Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Roxanna Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Aspire General Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/13/2019; Service Cost: 64.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Aspire General Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); Service Date: 05/11/2019; Service Cost: 64.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Aspire General Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Roxanna Rodriguez (Defendant); Ana Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Aspire General Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Roxanna Rodriguez (Defendant); Ana Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Aspire General Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Roxanna Rodriguez (Defendant); Ana Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC04247    Hearing Date: August 18, 2020    Dept: 26

Aspire General Ins. Co. v. Rodriguez, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP §§ 2030.290; 2031.300; 2033.280)

Matter is continued by the court to Friday, August 28, 2020 at 9:00 a.m.