This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2021 at 00:30:29 (UTC).

ASPEN PENALOZA VS LAUREN HOBB

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 ASPEN PENALOZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LAUREN HOBB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1224

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENALOZA ASPEN

Defendant

HOBB LAUREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KREIT THEODORE

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Petitioner Autumn Moss Penaloza in Support of Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action

11/5/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Petitioner Autumn Moss Penaloza in Support of Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

11/5/2020: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

11/20/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/20/2020

11/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/20/2020

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/1/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

12/1/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/4/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise) of 12/30/2020

12/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise) of 12/30/2020

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

12/30/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

12/30/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/5/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Regarding Proof of Funding

4/5/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Regarding Proof of Funding

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Aspen

3/30/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Aspen

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/6/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/6/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Aspen Penaloza on 02/06/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Aspen Penaloza as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration Regarding Proof of Funding; Filed by: Aspen Penaloza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous): Filed By: Aspen Penaloza (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 12/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Signed and Filed by: Aspen Penaloza (Plaintiff); As to: Aspen Penaloza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise) of 12/30/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise scheduled for 12/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 12/30/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Aspen Penaloza (Plaintiff); As to: Lauren Hobb (Defendant); Service Date: 12/03/2020; Service Cost: 130.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Aspen Penaloza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Lauren Hobb (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise scheduled for 12/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/20/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by: Aspen Penaloza (Plaintiff); As to: Aspen Penaloza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Petitioner Autumn Moss Penaloza in Support of Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action; Filed by: Aspen Penaloza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Aspen; Signed and Filed by: Aspen Penaloza (Plaintiff); As to: Aspen Penaloza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Theodore Kreit (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Grossman Law Offices, APLC to Grossman Law Offices

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC01224    Hearing Date: December 30, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Wed., December 30, 2020 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Penaloza v. Hobb COMPL. FILED: 02-06-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC01224 DISC. C/O: 09-04-21

NOTICE: OK MOTION C/O: 08-20-21

TRIAL DATE: 08-05-21

PROCEEDINGS: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF A PENDING ACTION ON BEHALF OF MINOR

MOVING PARTY: Petitioner Autumn Moss Penaloza on behalf of minor Claimant Aspen Penaloza

RESP. PARTY: None

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF A PENDING ACTION

(CCP § 372, CRC, rule 7.950)

TENTATIVE RULING:

The Petition to Approve Compromise of a Pending Action on Behalf of Minor Claimant Aspen Penaloza is GRANTED.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of December 18, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of December 18, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On February 6, 2020, minor Plaintiff Aspen Penaloza (“Claimant”), filed an action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Lauren Hobb (“Respondent”). Petitioner Autumn Moss Penaloza (“Petitioner”) was appointed as Claimant’s guardian ad litem on March 30, 2020. On November 5, 2020, Petitioner filed the instant Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action (the “Petition”) on behalf of Claimant.

On November 20, 2020, the Court found that although the Petition was complete and the proposed settlement reasonable in light of Claimant’s injuries, Respondent was not served with the Petition or the Complaint. (11/20/20 Minute Order.) For this reason, the Court set the Petition for hearing for December 30, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (Id.)

On December 4, 2020, Petitioner filed a proof of service demonstrating Respondent was personally served with the Complaint, Petition, and notice of hearing on December 3, 2020. (12/4/20 Proof of Service.)

As Petitioner has now addressed the Court’s concerns regarding service, the Petition is GRANTED.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, the Petition to Approve Compromise of a Pending Action on Behalf of Minor Claimant Aspen Penaloza is GRANTED.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KREIT THEODORE