This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2020 at 14:32:07 (UTC).

ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC VS MARCUS BURGESS

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARCUS BURGESS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA A. UZCATEGUI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2557

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA A. UZCATEGUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC

Defendant

BURGESS MARCUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPARKS VALERIE A.

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return (Wholly Satisfied As To Possession)

12/11/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return (Wholly Satisfied As To Possession)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/26/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

9/26/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/26/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/26/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

9/27/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Marcus Burgess)

9/27/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Marcus Burgess)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/15/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/15/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

10/24/2019: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

10/28/2019: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

10/30/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return (Wholly Satisfied As To Possession) ( ); Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Issued by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Marcus Burgess (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 46.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC against Defendant Marcus Burgess on the Complaint filed by ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC on 09/26/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 6331 Glade Avenue #H220, Woodland Hills, CA 91367 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Marcus Burgess (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC on 09/26/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC, does 1 through 10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Marcus Burgess (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Marcus Burgess; On the Complaint filed by ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC on 09/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Marcus Burgess (Defendant); Service Date: 10/06/2019; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jessica A. Uzcategui in Department H Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Marcus Burgess (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Marcus Burgess (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Marcus Burgess (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sparks, Valerie