This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2020 at 07:47:23 (UTC).

ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC VS JAMES COOK

Case Summary

On 08/27/2019 ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JAMES COOK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EMILY GARCIA UHRIG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2254

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

EMILY GARCIA UHRIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC

Defendant

COOK JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return (Wholly Satisfied as to Possession)

11/1/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return (Wholly Satisfied as to Possession)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/27/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

8/27/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/27/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/27/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/27/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (James Cook)

8/29/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (James Cook)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

8/29/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/18/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/18/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/18/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

10/7/2019: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

10/8/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return (Wholly Satisfied as to Possession) ( ); Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer: As To Parties changed from James Cook (Defendant) to James Cook (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer: As To Parties changed from James Cook (Defendant) to James Cook (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer: As To Parties changed from James Cook (Defendant) to James Cook (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Issued by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: James Cook (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 73.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC on 08/27/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC, does 1 through 10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: James Cook (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC against Defendant James Cook on the Complaint filed by ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC on 08/27/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 22111 Erwin Street #R225, Woodland Hills, CA 91367 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: James Cook (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/31/2019; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Emily Garcia Uhrig in Department H Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: James Cook (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: James Cook (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: James Cook (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS