Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2020 at 22:01:50 (UTC).

ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC VS ESHAN GUNASEKARA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ESHAN GUNASEKARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA A. UZCATEGUI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3084

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA A. UZCATEGUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC

Defendants

GUNASEKARA ESHAN

PEIRIS MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application for Stay of Execution of Judgment

2/13/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application for Stay of Execution of Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Stay of Execution of Judg...) of 02/14/2020

2/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Stay of Execution of Judg...) of 02/14/2020

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/22/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

11/22/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/22/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Michael Peiris)

11/26/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Michael Peiris)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Eshan Gunasekara)

11/26/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Eshan Gunasekara)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

11/26/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

12/11/2019: Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/14/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/14/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

1/14/2020: Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

1/14/2020: Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

1/15/2020: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

1/16/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

1/17/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application for Stay of execution of Judgment

1/30/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application for Stay of execution of Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ex-Parte Proceedings for Stay of execution of Judgment) of 01/31/2020

1/31/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ex-Parte Proceedings for Stay of execution of Judgment) of 01/31/2020

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application for Stay of Execution of Judgment: Filed By: Michael Peiris (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application for Stay of Execution of Judgment scheduled for 02/14/2020 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Stay of Execution of Judg...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Stay of Execution of Judg...) of 02/14/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application for Stay of Execution of Judgment scheduled for 02/14/2020 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department H updated: Result Date to 02/14/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Stay of Execution of Judgment; Filed by: Michael Peiris (Defendant); As to: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketEx-parte Ex-Parte Proceedings for Stay of Execution of Judgment scheduled for 02/13/2020 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application for Stay of execution of Judgment: Filed By: Michael Peiris (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings for Stay of execution of Judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ex-Parte Proceedings for Stay of execution of Judgment) of 01/31/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application for Order to Post: Filed By: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application for Order to Post: Status Date changed from 12/12/2019 to 12/11/2019; As To Parties changed from Eshan Gunasekara (Defendant), Michael Peiris (Defendant) to Eshan Gunasekara (Defendant), Michael Peiris (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/31/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jessica A. Uzcategui in Department H Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Eshan Gunasekara (Defendant); Michael Peiris (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Eshan Gunasekara (Defendant); Michael Peiris (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Eshan Gunasekara (Defendant); Michael Peiris (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS