Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2018 at 12:13:57 (UTC).

ARTEMIO ISIDORO VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOL...

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 ARTEMIO ISIDORO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2685

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ISIDORO ARTEMINO

Baldwin Park, CA 91706

ISIDORO ARTEMIO

Baldwin Park, CA 91706

Defendant

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN-TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY METRO

 

Court Documents

Unknown

12/20/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

2/9/2018: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

2/9/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/4/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/9/2018: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/09/2018

2/9/2018: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/09/2018

Unknown

12/20/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan-Transportation Authority (Metro) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/09/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/09/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 02/09/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to the Settlement Agreement, 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Artemio Isidoro (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan-Transportation Authority (Metro) (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 01/02/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Updated -- Artemio Isidoro (Plaintiff): First Name changed from Artemino to Artemio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • ** Case Name changed from ARTEMINO ISIDORO vs LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN-TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY (METRO) to ARTEMIO ISIDORO vs LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOL...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/09/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Artemino Isidoro (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan-Transportation Authority (Metro) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Artemino Isidoro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less