This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2019 at 01:50:56 (UTC).

ARROW SPEED LINE INC A CALIFOR VS KINGO'S TRADING CORP, A CALIFO

Case Summary

On 08/25/2015 ARROW SPEED LINE INC A CALIFOR filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KINGO'S TRADING CORP, A CALIFO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2327

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARROW SPEED LINE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

KINGO'S TRADING CORP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LAU YUK KING AKA LAU SALINA AN INDIVIDUAL

HO KEVINAN INDIVIDUAL

HO KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLIFFORD P. JUNG & ASSOCIATES - CLIFFORD P. JUNG ESQ

Attorney at CLIFFORD P. JUNG & ASSOCIATES

JUNG CLIFFORD P. ESQ

 

Court Documents

Summons

8/25/2015: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/25/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/25/2015: Complaint

Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (LAU, YUK KING) AKA (LAU, SALINA) ON 08/25/15 . COSTS OF $ 21.00

8/26/2015: Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (LAU, YUK KING) AKA (LAU, SALINA) ON 08/25/15 . COSTS OF $ 21.00

Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (HO, KEVIN) SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH YUK KING LAU ON 08/26/15 . COSTS OF $ 21.00

8/26/2015: Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (HO, KEVIN) SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH YUK KING LAU ON 08/26/15 . COSTS OF $ 21.00

Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (KINGOS'S TRADING CORP.) SERVED YUK KING LAU ON 08/25/15 . COSTS OF $ 63.00

8/26/2015: Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (KINGOS'S TRADING CORP.) SERVED YUK KING LAU ON 08/25/15 . COSTS OF $ 63.00

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/26/2015: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Bankruptcy

9/8/2015: Notice of Bankruptcy

Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Fa...)

8/9/2018: Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Fa...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Fa...) of 08/09/2018

8/9/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Fa...) of 08/09/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2018
  • Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Fa...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Fa...) of 08/09/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 08/09/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 08/09/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Updated -- Event scheduled for 08/09/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Type changed from Order to Show Cause - Hearing (name extension) to Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS RE: BANKRUPTCY FILED BY (KINGO'S TRADING CORP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION) . ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS STAYED AS TO (KINGO'S TRADING CORP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION) , (LAU, YUK KING) AKA (LAU, SALINA) AN INDIVIDUAL , (HO, KEVIN)AN INDIVIDUAL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 08/09/18 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY DANIEL P. RAMIREZ TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (KINGOS'S TRADING CORP.) SERVED YUK KING LAU ON 08/25/15 . COSTS OF $ 63.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (LAU, YUK KING) AKA (LAU, SALINA) ON 08/25/15 . COSTS OF $ 21.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (HO, KEVIN) SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH YUK KING LAU ON 08/26/15 . COSTS OF $ 21.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR481437010. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (ARROW SPEED LINE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLIFFORD P. JUNG & ASSOCIATES - CLIFFORD P. JUNG ESQ