This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/07/2020 at 23:30:25 (UTC).

ARNELL PRADEL VS TPS SOLUTIONS INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2017 ARNELL PRADEL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TPS SOLUTIONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1637

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRADEL ARNELL

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendants

TPS SOLUTIONS INC DBA STAFFING SOLUTIONS GROUP

2295 De La Cruz Blvd,

Santa Clara, CA 95050

STAFFING SOLUTIONS GROUP

450 Westmont Drive,

San Pedro, CA 90731

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

4/3/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

6/13/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 06/13/2018

6/13/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 06/13/2018

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

5/10/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

5/10/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 05/10/2018

5/10/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 05/10/2018

Proof of Service - No Service

4/11/2018: Proof of Service - No Service

Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

4/11/2018: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

7/27/2018: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Notice of Rejection

7/12/2018: Notice of Rejection

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

7/12/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Notice of Rejection

6/27/2018: Notice of Rejection

RETURNED MAIL - Staffing Solutions Group - Minute Order - 1/4/18

1/17/2018: RETURNED MAIL - Staffing Solutions Group - Minute Order - 1/4/18

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/4/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

1/4/2018: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

1/4/2018: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/4/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/4/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 04/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Partially Satisfied); Clerk; Costs Credits: 139.00; Interest Credits: 212.91; Principal Credits: 3,608.30; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles; Principal: 3,555.00; Interest: 171.42; Costs: 75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Arnell Pradel (Plaintiff); Costs: 75.00; Interest: 171.42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Arnell Pradel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 07/12/2018 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13 updated: Result Date to 07/12/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Arnell Pradel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Arnell Pradel on 12/04/2017, Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to Staffing Solutions Group

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/04/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Arnell Pradel (Plaintiff); As to: TPS Solutions Inc (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 12/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Arnell Pradel (Plaintiff); As to: TPS Solutions Inc (Defendant); Staffing Solutions Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Arnell Pradel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Arnell Pradel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Douglas W. Stern in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/04/2018 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TPS SOLUTIONS, INC. is a litigant