This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2020 at 00:58:11 (UTC).

ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC, A CORPORATION VS THE CHEERS BAR & GRILL, INC, A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THE CHEERS BAR GRILL, INC, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6857

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC A CORPORATION

Defendant

THE CHEERS BAR & GRILL INC A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES TODD FREDERICK

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/14/2018: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/14/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/14/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/14/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/14/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum and Statement of Location

12/14/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum and Statement of Location

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/12/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/29/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Of Attorney Pursuant to code of civil procedure 1033

8/6/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Of Attorney Pursuant to code of civil procedure 1033

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re Memorandum of Pre-Judgement Interest

8/6/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re Memorandum of Pre-Judgement Interest

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration In Lieu of Testimony in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgement from the Court under CCP Section 585 (d)

8/6/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration In Lieu of Testimony in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgement from the Court under CCP Section 585 (d)

Declaration Pursuant to 1717 CC re: Attorney Fees - Declaration Pursuant to 1717 CC re: Attorney Fees

8/6/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 1717 CC re: Attorney Fees - Declaration Pursuant to 1717 CC re: Attorney Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/6/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/6/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Judgment - default judgment

8/26/2019: Judgment - default judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

10/18/2019: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Armored Group International, inc, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Armored Group International, inc, a corporation against Defendant The Cheers Bar & Grill, Inc, a corporation on the Complaint filed by Armored Group International, inc, a corporation on 12/14/2018 for the principal amount of $5,630.31, attorney fees of $960.00, interest of $949.13, and costs of $289.00 for a total of $7,828.44.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Docketdefault judgment; Filed by: Armored Group International, inc, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Armored Group International, inc, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Armored Group International, inc, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 1717 CC re: Attorney Fees; Filed by: Armored Group International, inc, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketDeclaration In Lieu of Testimony in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgement from the Court under CCP Section 585 (d); Filed by: Armored Group International, inc, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Re Memorandum of Pre-Judgement Interest; Filed by: Armored Group International, inc, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Of Attorney Pursuant to code of civil procedure 1033; Filed by: Armored Group International, inc, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Docket; On the Complaint filed by Armored Group International, inc, a corporation on 12/14/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F43 - Hon. Robert Schuit; Reason: Transfer for Reassignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Armored Group International, inc, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: The Cheers Bar & Grill, Inc, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Armored Group International, inc, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: The Cheers Bar & Grill, Inc, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Armored Group International, inc, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: The Cheers Bar & Grill, Inc, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum and Statement of Location; Filed by: Armored Group International, inc, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: The Cheers Bar & Grill, Inc, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less