This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/05/2020 at 13:58:58 (UTC).

ARMOND ISAYAN VS CURBSTAND INC

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 ARMOND ISAYAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CURBSTAND INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2826

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISAYAN ARMOND

Defendant

CURBSTAND INC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/3/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/3/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

8/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

Attachment - Attachment

8/6/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/16/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

4/24/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

4/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/23/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) David Cano/SVP Operations

1/28/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) David Cano/SVP Operations

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/25/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

1/28/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

1/28/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 01/28/2020

1/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 01/28/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/22/2019

11/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/22/2019

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Curbstand Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/03/2020 at 03:00 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 11/03/2020; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment]; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 11/03/2020 03:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 11/22/2019; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Armond Isayan against Defendant Curbstand Inc on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Armond Isayan on 09/25/2019 for the principal amount of $5,311.14 and costs of $200.00 for a total of $5,511.14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/22/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service RE: Arya Alexander; Filed by: Armond Isayan (Plaintiff); As to: Curbstand Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/25/2019; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Armond Isayan (Plaintiff); As to: Curbstand Inc (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Armond Isayan (Plaintiff); As to: Curbstand Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less