This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 02:13:58 (UTC).

ARMAN GALSTYAN VS CHRISTOPHER CONTRERAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 ARMAN GALSTYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER CONTRERAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0951

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALSTYAN ARMAN

Defendants

AVILA ELBA MUNOZ

CONTRERAS CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAGRAMANOV VLADIMIR

Defendant Attorneys

WELLS MICHELLE

DESALERNOS STEFANIE

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RECLASSIFYING LIMITED JURISDICTION ACTION TO SMALL CLAIMS MATTER

4/5/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RECLASSIFYING LIMITED JURISDICTION ACTION TO SMALL CLAIMS MATTER

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

1/26/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

2/17/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel FORM INTERROGATORIES; Hearing on ...)

3/22/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel FORM INTERROGATORIES; Hearing on ...)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

3/22/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel form Interrogatories

9/23/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel form Interrogatories

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Demand for Production of Documents

9/23/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Demand for Production of Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/05/2020

6/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/05/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/5/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Answer - Answer

6/10/2020: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

6/10/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/30/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/28/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/28/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

1/28/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/28/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • Hearing12/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Hearing08/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Hearing06/08/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RECLASSIFYING LIMITED JURISDICTION ACTION TO SMALL CLAIMS MATTER: Filed By: ARMAN GALSTYAN (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order RECLASSIFYING LIMITED JURISDICTION ACTION TO SMALL CLAIMS MATTER: Status Date changed from 03/24/2021 to 04/05/2021; Name Extension changed from STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RECLASSIFYING LIMITED JURISDICTION ACTION TO SMALL CLAIMS MATTER to RECLASSIFYING LIMITED JURISDICTION ACTION TO SMALL CLAIMS MATTER; Result Date changed from 04/05/2021 to 04/05/2021; As To Parties changed from ELBA MUNOZ AVILA (Defendant), CHRISTOPHER CONTRERAS (Defendant) to ELBA MUNOZ AVILA (Defendant), CHRISTOPHER CONTRERAS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/31/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 04/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion: Filed By: CHRISTOPHER CONTRERAS (Defendant),ELBA MUNOZ AVILA (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: ARMAN GALSTYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel FORM INTERROGATORIES; Hearing on ...)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: ARMAN GALSTYAN (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTOPHER CONTRERAS (Defendant); Service Date: 04/27/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ARMAN GALSTYAN (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTOPHER CONTRERAS (Defendant); ELBA MUNOZ AVILA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ARMAN GALSTYAN (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTOPHER CONTRERAS (Defendant); ELBA MUNOZ AVILA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ARMAN GALSTYAN (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTOPHER CONTRERAS (Defendant); ELBA MUNOZ AVILA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC00951    Hearing Date: March 22, 2021    Dept: 26

Galstyan v. Contreras, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2030.290, 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendants Christopher Contreras and Elba Munoz Avila’s (1) Motion To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories and Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion To Compel Responses To Demand For Production Of Documents and Request for Sanctions are GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. PLAINTIFF AND COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS TO $370.00 TO DEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

OSC R: Failure to File Proof of Service  scheduled for 01/31/22 is Discharged.

Trial is set for 1/31/22 at 8:30 AM

ANALYSIS:

Defendants Christopher Contreras and Elba Munoz Avila (“Defendants”) propounded Form Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents on Plaintiff Arman Galstyan (“Plaintiff”) on June 9, 2020. (Motions, Wells Decl., Exh. A.) Following Plaintiff’s failure to provide timely responses, defense counsel sent a meet and confer letter to Plaintiff’s counsel. (Id. at Exhs. B-C.) Following no response from Plaintiff after the last deadline, Defendants filed the instant (1) Motion To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories, Set One; and (2) Motion To Compel Responses To Demand For Production Of Documents on September 23, 2020. (Id. at ¶5.)

Based on Plaintiff’s failure to serve initial responses, the Motions to compel responses to interrogatories and request for production are granted. There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to compel initial responses or deem admissions admitted can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300.)

Plaintiff’s failure to timely respond constitutes a misuse of the discovery process. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).) Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010 and 2023.030 and have been properly noticed. However, the amount sought is excessive under a lodestar calculation. Therefore, the requests for sanctions are granted against Plaintiff and counsel of record in the amount of $370.00 based on one hour of attorney time billed at $250.00 an hour, plus $120.00 in costs. (Motions, Wells Decl., ¶6.) The sanctions are to be paid within 20 days’ service of this order.

Therefore, Defendants’ (1) Motion To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories and Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion To Compel Responses To Demand For Production Of Documents and Request for Sanctions are GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. PLAINTIFF AND COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS TO $370.00 TO DEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

OSC R: Failure to File Proof of Service  scheduled for 01/31/22 is Discharged.

Trial is set for 01/31/22 at 8:30 AM

Clerk to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DESALERNOS STEFANIE CHRISTINE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLS MICHELLE