This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2019 at 13:07:17 (UTC).

ARINA ARTAMONOVA VS MICHELLE KANG

Case Summary

On 06/15/2016 ARINA ARTAMONOVA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MICHELLE KANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN L. BERMAN and RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0517

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

STEVEN L. BERMAN

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARTAMONOVA ARINA

Encino, CA 91316

Defendant

KANG MICHELLE DBA GREEN CLEANERS

Los Angeles, CA 90035

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/17/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 10/17/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

10/17/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 10/17/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/17/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

12/12/2016: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/15/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

6/15/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/15/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/15/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

8/15/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

6/22/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/15/2016

8/15/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/15/2016

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/15/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2017
  • Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Filed by: Arina Artamonova (Plaintiff); County: Los Angeles; Principal: 1,030.00; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Payment: 25.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0007317 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 10/17/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 10/17/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Arina Artamonova against Defendant Michelle Kang DBA Green Cleaners on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Arina Artamonova on 06/15/2016 for the principal amount of $1,000.00 and costs of $30.00 for a total of $1,030.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Arina Artamonova (Plaintiff); As to: Michelle Kang (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: 1160615E8089 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160615E8089 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Steven L. Berman at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/15/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Arina Artamonova (Plaintiff); As to: Michelle Kang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.