This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2021 at 05:40:34 (UTC).

ARDEN SILVERMAN VS JASON PAUL MATHEW ELLIS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 ARDEN SILVERMAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JASON PAUL MATHEW ELLIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7832

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILVERMAN ARDEN DBA CAPITAL ASSET PROTECTION

Defendants

ELLIS JASON PAUL MATHEW

HIGH STYLE LA LLC

JPE HOLDINGS LLC

ELLIS HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KALAJIAN JOHN M

Defendant Attorney

COHEN JEFFREY AARON

 

Court Documents

Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement

8/26/2021: Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

7/8/2021: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Answer - Answer

5/25/2021: Answer - Answer

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

5/27/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default

3/8/2021: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/6/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

4/9/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

4/9/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

4/9/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Notice (name extension) - Notice Proof of Legal Representation

4/12/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice Proof of Legal Representation

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/30/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/30/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/2/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/16/2020: Complaint - Complaint

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2023
  • Hearing09/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Hearing03/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • Hearing12/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Enforce Settlement AGREEMENT: Name Extension: AGREEMENT; As To Parties changed from Jason Paul Mathew Ellis (Defendant), JPE Holdings, LLC (Defendant), Ellis Holdings, LLC (Defendant), High Style LA, LLC (Defendant) to High Style LA, LLC (Defendant), JPE Holdings, LLC (Defendant), Jason Paul Mathew Ellis (Defendant), Ellis Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketMotion to Enforce Settlement; Filed by: arden silverman (Plaintiff); As to: Jason Paul Mathew Ellis (Defendant); Ellis Holdings, LLC (Defendant); High Style LA, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement scheduled for 12/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Filed By: arden silverman (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 07/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 05/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: arden silverman (Plaintiff); As to: JPE Holdings, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/26/2020; Service Cost: 85.91; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: arden silverman (Plaintiff); As to: High Style LA, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/26/2020; Service Cost: 185.92; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: arden silverman (Plaintiff); As to: Ellis Holdings, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/26/2020; Service Cost: 85.91; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: arden silverman (Plaintiff); As to: Jason Paul Mathew Ellis (Defendant); Ellis Holdings, LLC (Defendant); High Style LA, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: arden silverman (Plaintiff); As to: Jason Paul Mathew Ellis (Defendant); Ellis Holdings, LLC (Defendant); High Style LA, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: arden silverman (Plaintiff); As to: Jason Paul Mathew Ellis (Defendant); Ellis Holdings, LLC (Defendant); High Style LA, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC07832    Hearing Date: May 27, 2021    Dept: 25

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT, TO RECALL AND QUASH WRIT OF EXECUTION, AND VACATE LEVY

MOVING PARTY: Defendant Jason Paul Matthew Ellis on behalf of himself and Ellis Holdings, LLC, High Style LA, LLC, and JPE Holdings, LLC

RESP. PARTY: Plaintiff Arden Silverman, in pro per

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

(CCP § 473(b))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendants Jason Paul Matthew Ellis, Ellis Holdings, LLC, High Style LA, LLC, and JPE Holdings, LLC’s Motion is PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: Filed on March 22, 2021 [ ] Late [ ] None

REPLY: Filed on April 6, 2021 [X] Late [ ] None

ANALYSIS:

I. Background & Discussion

On September 16, 2020, Plaintiff Arden Silverman dba Capital Asset Protection (“Plaintiff”), in pro per, filed an action against Defendants Jason Paul Matthew Ellis (“Ellis”), Ellis Holdings, LLC (“Ellis Holdings”), High Style LA, LLC (“High Style”), and JPE Holdings, LLC (“JPE”) (collectively, “Defendants”). Following Defendants’ failure to respond, default was entered against them on December 3, 2020. No default judgment has yet been entered.

Defendant Ellis, in pro per, on behalf of all Defendants, filed the instant Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Default Judgment, to Recall and Quash Writ of Execution, and to Vacate Levy (the “Motion”) on March 8, 2021. Plaintiff filed an Opposition on March 22 and Defendant Ellis filed a late Reply on April 6.

At the initial April 12 hearing, the Court noted that Defendant Ellis could not file this Motion on behalf of the other three entity Defendants because they were required to be represented by counsel. (4/12/21 Minute Order.) The matter was continued to give Defendants an opportunity to find and retain counsel. (Id.)

On May 4, 2021, Defendants, through their attorney, filed a stipulation to set aside the default entered against them on December 3, 2020 so that the parties could proceed with settlement negotiations. (5/4/21 Stipulation.) The order pursuant to this stipulation was signed that same day and Defendants were ordered to file their answers within thirty days. (5/4/21 Order.)

As the subject of this Motion has been resolved by stipulation, it is PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT.

II. Conclusion & Order

Defendants Jason Paul Matthew Ellis, Ellis Holdings, LLC, High Style LA, LLC, and JPE Holdings, LLC’s Motion is PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT.

Moving parties are ordered to give notice.

Case Number: 20STLC07832    Hearing Date: April 12, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Mon., April 12, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Silverman v. Ellis, et al. COMPL. FILED: 09-16-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC07832 DISC. C/O: 02-14-22

NOTICE: OK DISC. C/O MOT.: 03-01-22

TRIAL DATE: 03-16-22

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT, TO RECALL AND QUASH WRIT OF EXECUTION, AND VACATE LEVY

MOVING PARTY: Defendant Jason Paul Matthew Ellis on behalf of himself and Ellis Holdings, LLC, High Style LA, LLC, and JPE Holdings, LLC, in pro per

RESP. PARTY: Plaintiff Arden Silverman, in pro per

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

(CCP § 473(b))

TENTATIVE RULING:

To provide Defendant Jason Paul Matthew Ellis an opportunity to find, retain, and file proof of retention of counsel, the Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Default filed on behalf of himself and Defendants Ellis Holdings, LLC, High Style LA, LLC, and JPE Holdings, LLC is CONTINUED TO MAY 27, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least five (5) court days before the next scheduled hearing, Defendants must file and serve proof of legal representation. Failure to do so may result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: Filed on March 22, 2021 [ ] Late [ ] None

REPLY: Filed on April 6, 2021 [X] Late [ ] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On September 16, 2020, Plaintiff Arden Silverman dba Capital Asset Protection (“Plaintiff”), in pro per, filed an action against Defendants Jason Paul Matthew Ellis (“Ellis”), Ellis Holdings, LLC (“Ellis Holdings”), High Style LA, LLC (“High Style”), and JPE Holdings, LLC (“JPE”) (collectively, “Defendants”). Following Defendants’ failure to respond, default was entered against them on December 3, 2020. No default judgment has yet been entered.

Defendant Ellis, in pro per, on behalf of all Defendants, filed the instant Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Default Judgment, to Recall and Quash Writ of Execution, and to Vacate Levy (the “Motion”) on March 8, 2021. Plaintiff filed an Opposition on March 22 and Defendant Ellis filed a late Reply on April 6.

As an initial matter, the Court notes that although Defendant Ellis may file a motion to set aside the default on behalf of himself, he may not do so on behalf of entity Defendants Ellis Holdings, High Style, and JPE.

Since the passage of the State Bar Act in 1927, persons may represent their own interests in legal proceedings, but may not represent the interests of another unless they are active members of the State Bar. [Citation.]” (Hansen v. Hansen (2003) 114 Cal.App.4th 618, 621.) An entity must be represented by a lawyer in legal proceedings and may not represent itself (either directly or through a non-lawyer agent) in litigation, as such an act would be the unauthorized practice of law. (See e.g. Caressa Camille, Inc. v. Alcoholic Beverage Control Appeals Bd. (2002) 99 Cal.App.4th 1094, 1101) (corporation); Albion River Watershed Protection Ass’n v. Department of Forestry & Fire Protection (1993) 20 Cal. App. 4th 34, 37 (unincorporated association); Aulisio v. Bancroft (2014) 230 Cal. App. 4th 1518, 1519-20 (trustee for trust).

Thus, to allow Defendants an opportunity to seek and retain counsel, the Motion is CONTINUED.

  1. Conclusion & Order

To provide Defendant Jason Paul Matthew Ellis an opportunity to find, retain, and file proof of retention of counsel, the Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Default filed on behalf of himself and Defendants Ellis Holdings, LLC, High Style LA, LLC, and JPE Holdings, LLC is CONTINUED TO MAY 27, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least five (5) court days before the next scheduled hearing, Defendants must file and serve proof of legal representation. Failure to do so may result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KALAJIAN, JOHN M.