This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2019 at 06:40:36 (UTC).

ARASH FEYZJOU VS DOUGLAS MARTIN FIERRO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 a Other case was filed by ARASH FEYZJOU against DOUGLAS MARTIN FIERRO in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3743

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FEYZJOU ARASH

Respondents

FIERRO DOUGLAS MARTIN

DOUGLAS MARTIN CONSTRUCTION

 

Court Documents

Petition (name extension) - Petition Petition to Correct Contractual Arbitration Award

8/30/2019: Petition (name extension) - Petition Petition to Correct Contractual Arbitration Award

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/30/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/30/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

8/30/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • Hearing01/03/2020 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Petition (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketPetition Petition to Correct Contractual Arbitration Award; Filed by: Arash Feyzjou (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Arash Feyzjou (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Correct Contractual Arbitration Award scheduled for 01/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCP03743    Hearing Date: March 09, 2020    Dept: 25

PETITION TO CORRECT ARBITRATION AWARD

(CCP §1286.6; 1286.8)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioner Arash Feyzjou’s Petition to Correct Contractual Arbitration Award is CONTINUED to APRIL 29, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Petitioner must file and serve supplemental papers correcting the deficiencies identified herein. Failure to do so may result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied.

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On March 19, 2019, the Contractors State License Board Program awarded an arbitration award of $5,538.00 in favor of Petitioner Arash Feyzjou (“Petitioner”) and against Respondents Douglas Martin Fierro and Douglas Martin Construction (collectively, “Respondents”).

On August 30, 2019, Petitioner initiated this action with the instant Petition to Correct Contractual Arbitration Award (the “Petition”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

As an initial matter, the Court notes that there is no proof of service attached to the Petition. Code of Civil Procedure, section 1290.4 requires the Petition and Notice of Hearing to be served on Respondents “in the manner provided in the arbitration agreement for the service of such petition and notice” or “[i]f the arbitration agreement does not provide the manner in which such service shall be made . . . [s]ervice within this State shall be made in the manner provided by law for the service of summons in an action.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 1290.4, subds. (a), (b).)

Accordingly, Petitioner is ordered to serve the Petition and Notice of Hearing on Respondent, and file a proof of service demonstrating compliance with Code of Civil Procedure section 1290.4.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Petitioner Arash Feyzjou’s Petition to Correct Contractual Arbitration Award is CONTINUED to APRIL 29, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Petitioner must file and serve supplemental papers correcting the deficiencies identified herein. Failure to do so may result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.