This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2019 at 01:08:30 (UTC).

APOYO FINANCIERO, INC. VS JULIO CESAR DAVALOS LUNA

Case Summary

On 10/05/2018 APOYO FINANCIERO, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JULIO CESAR DAVALOS LUNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5020

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APOYO FINANCIERO INC.

3100 Oak Road, Suite 210

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Defendant

DAVALOS LUNA JULIO CESAR

Paramount, CA 90723

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/22/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/11/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/19/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

1/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

1/11/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/13/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/13/2018

12/13/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/13/2018

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/19/2019

3/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/19/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/13/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 06/11/2019

6/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 06/11/2019

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/5/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

6/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/11/2019

6/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/11/2019

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Apoyo Financiero, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Apoyo Financiero, Inc. on 10/05/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Julio Cesar Davalos Luna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/11/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 06/11/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 06/11/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Apoyo Financiero, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Apoyo Financiero, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/13/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/19/2019 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Apoyo Financiero, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Julio Cesar Davalos Luna (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/22/2018; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Apoyo Financiero, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Julio Cesar Davalos Luna (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.