This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2021 at 00:10:54 (UTC).

ANYTIME RENT A CAR, INC. VS LARRY RADFORD

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 ANYTIME RENT A CAR, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LARRY RADFORD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8887

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANYTIME RENT A CAR INC. DBA ANYTIME AUTO GROUP

Defendant

RADFORD LARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FIROUZNAM-HEIDARI JENOS

DEMPSEY MAIYA KEATES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/20/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/20/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/20/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

11/16/2020: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Motion to Consolidate - Motion to Consolidate

1/19/2021: Motion to Consolidate - Motion to Consolidate

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)

2/22/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate) of 02/22/2021

2/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate) of 02/22/2021

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

3/16/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/16/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 06/15/2021

6/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 06/15/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

6/15/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketAddress for Maiya Keates Dempsey (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Anytime Rent a Car, Inc. on 10/20/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Anytime Rent a Car, Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 06/15/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 06/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/29/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: Status Date changed from 03/16/2021 to 03/16/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 06/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement): Status Date changed from 03/16/2021 to 03/16/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Consolidate scheduled for 02/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Anytime Rent a Car, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Anytime Rent a Car, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Larry Radford (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Anytime Rent a Car, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Larry Radford (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Anytime Rent a Car, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Larry Radford (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC08887    Hearing Date: February 22, 2021    Dept: 26

Anytime Rent a Car, Inc. v. Radford, et al.

CONSOLIDATION

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1048(a))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Anytime Rent a Car, Inc. dba Anytime Auto Group’s Motion to Consolidate is DENIED

ANALYSIS:

On October 20, 2020, Plaintiff Anytime Rent a Car, Inc. dba Anytime Auto Group (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for breach of contract, common counts and declaratory relief against Defendant Larry Radford (“Defendant”). On November 16, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Related Case with respect to Radford v. Anytime Rent a Car, Inc., LASC Case No. 20STLC08887 (“the Small Claims action”). The Small Claims action was filed by Defendant against Plaintiff on October 7, 2020 in the Small Claims Department and assigned to the Long Beach Courthouse. Plaintiff filed a Notice of Related Case in the Small Claims action with respect to this action on December 14, 2020.

Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Consolidate in the current action on January 19, 2021. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

A Small Claims defendant who seeks to bring a cross-claim in excess of the jurisdictional limit must follow the procedure set forth at Code of Civil Procedure section 116.390. Plaintiff has not demonstrated compliance with the statutory requirements of Code of Civil Procedure section 116.390. Nor has Plaintiff otherwise filed proof of service of the Summons and Complaint on Defendant in this action. Therefore, the Court does not have personal jurisdiction over Defendant at this time. (Borsuk v. Appellate Division of Superior Court (2015) 242 Cal.App.4th 607, 612 [“service of summons is not effective and the court does not acquire jurisdiction of the party unless the statutory requirements for service of summons are met.”].)

Conclusion

Plaintiff Anytime Rent a Car, Inc. dba Anytime Auto Group’s Motion to Consolidate is DENIED.

Court clerk to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANYTIME RENT A CAR INC. DBA ANYTIME AUTO GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEMPSEY MAIYA KEATES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIROUZNAM-HEIDARI JENOS