This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2019 at 15:22:54 (UTC).

ANTONY, MARK VS HESSELTINE, DEBBIE

Case Summary

On 04/12/2012 ANTONY, MARK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HESSELTINE, DEBBIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0325

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTONY MARK

Defendant

HESSELTINE DEBBIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTONY, MARK

Defendant Attorney

HESSELTINE, DEBBIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2012
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT FULLY RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT FULLY SATISFIED AS TO POSSESSION ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • appearing in pro per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • Plaintiff(s) Defendant(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • appearing in pro per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • CI43-MINS CIVIL MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • TRIAL MINUTES SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 05/10/12, 08:30 AM, DEPT 88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED- 1 HR(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • RESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less