This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 01:22:22 (UTC).

ANTONIO MORENO VS LYNSEY THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 ANTONIO MORENO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LYNSEY THOMPSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4923

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO ANTONIO

South Gate, CA 90280

Defendant

THOMPSON LYNSEY

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

10/2/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

10/2/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/25/2019

6/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/25/2019

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

1/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

10/2/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/12/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/2/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

1/11/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Antonio Moreno on 10/02/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/25/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 06/25/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/25/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketNotice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Antonio Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/12/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 12/12/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion; Result Type from Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/12/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Antonio Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Lynsey Thompson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.