This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2020 at 21:32:29 (UTC).

ANTONIO MIRANDA-PEREZ VS EL POLLO AUTO, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 ANTONIO MIRANDA-PEREZ filed an Other lawsuit against EL POLLO AUTO, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3993

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRANDA-PEREZ ANTONIO

Defendants

EL POLLO AUTO INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEYDARI NIMA SAM

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/1/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/7/2018: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/7/2018: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

12/14/2018: Answer - Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/16/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/16/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/16/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/16/2018: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Antonio Miranda-Perez on 11/16/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Antonio Miranda-Perez as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Antonio Miranda-Perez (Plaintiff); As to: El Pollo Auto, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: El Pollo Auto, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Antonio Miranda-Perez (Plaintiff); As to: El Pollo Auto, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Antonio Miranda-Perez (Plaintiff); As to: Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Antonio Miranda-Perez (Plaintiff); As to: El Pollo Auto, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Antonio Miranda-Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EL POLLO AUTO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEYDARI NIMA SAM