This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2021 at 01:28:58 (UTC).

ANTONIO GONZALEZ VS FOREST LAWN

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 ANTONIO GONZALEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against FOREST LAWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1478

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ ANTONIO

Defendants

DAVIS CHERYL

FOREST LAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MCNAMARA THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

8/12/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

8/12/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 08/12/2021

8/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 08/12/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)

7/13/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons) of 07/13/2020

7/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons) of 07/13/2020

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Hearing and Order Re Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint

4/27/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Hearing and Order Re Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint

Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Motion to Quash Service of Summons

3/30/2020: Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/15/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/13/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/13/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/13/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/18/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Antonio Gonzalez on 02/13/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 581(b)(3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 08/12/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 08/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons) of 07/13/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons scheduled for 07/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 07/13/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance of Hearing and Order Re Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by: FOREST LAWN (Defendant); DAVIS CHERYL (Defendant); As to: Antonio Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Antonio Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Antonio Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: FOREST LAWN (Defendant); DAVIS CHERYL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Antonio Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: FOREST LAWN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Antonio Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Antonio Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: FOREST LAWN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC01478    Hearing Date: July 13, 2020    Dept: 26

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

(CCP § 418.10)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Cheryl Davis’ Motion to Quash Service of the Summons and Complaint is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:Plaintiff Antonio Gonzalez (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for discrimination on the basis of disability against Defendants Forest Law, a business form unknown, and Cherly Davis (“Defendant Davis”) (erroneously sued as Davis Chery, a business form unknown) on February 13, 2020. To date, no proof of service has been filed as to either Defendant.

On March 30, 2020, Defendant Davis filed the instant Motion to Quash Service of the Summons and Complaint. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

The Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. The Motion is premature because no proof of service of the Summons and Complaint has been filed as to moving Defendant Cheryl Davis.

Court clerk to give notice.