This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 01:18:07 (UTC).

ANTONIA ISABEL HUEZO, ET AL. VS LGI ASSOCIATION, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 ANTONIA ISABEL HUEZO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LGI ASSOCIATION, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4602

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HUEZO VEGA CARLOS HUMBERTO

HUEZO ANTONIA ISABEL

Defendants

DROUIN REALTY INC. A CORPORATION AKA DROUIN MANAGEMENT COMPANY

LGI ASSOCIATION INC. A CORPORATION AKA LGI PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

9/6/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/6/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

9/6/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/26/2018: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by ANTONIA ISABEL HUEZO, et al. on 09/06/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by ANTONIA ISABEL HUEZO and VEGA CARLOS HUMBERTO HUEZO as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: ANTONIA ISABEL HUEZO (Plaintiff); VEGA CARLOS HUMBERTO HUEZO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/07/2018 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/07/2018 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ANTONIA ISABEL HUEZO (Plaintiff); VEGA CARLOS HUMBERTO HUEZO (Plaintiff); As to: LGI Association, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Drouin Realty, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less