This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2020 at 12:02:43 (UTC).

ANTHONY RAY MCFARLAND VS MASJID QURTUBAH CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 ANTHONY RAY MCFARLAND filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MASJID QURTUBAH CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5084

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCFARLAND ANTHONY RAY

Defendants

MASJID QURTUBAH CORPORATION

NUREDDIN NIJMEDDIN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/14/2020

1/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/14/2020

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/14/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/23/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/6/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/14/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/23/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/14/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/9/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]

12/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Anthony Ray Mcfarland (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Anthony Ray Mcfarland on 12/06/2019, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/14/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketAddress for Anthony Ray Mcfarland (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 01/14/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Nijmeddin Nureddin (Defendant) to Nijmeddin Nureddin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Masjid Qurtubah Corporation (Defendant) to Masjid Qurtubah Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Anthony Ray Mcfarland (Plaintiff); As to: Nijmeddin Nureddin (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Anthony Ray Mcfarland (Plaintiff); As to: Masjid Qurtubah Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Filed By: Anthony Ray Mcfarland (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 12/09/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Anthony Ray Mcfarland (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Anthony Ray Mcfarland (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Anthony Ray Mcfarland (Plaintiff); As to: Masjid Qurtubah Corporation (Defendant); Nijmeddin Nureddin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less