This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 10:43:47 (UTC).

ANTHONY NAVARRO VS JUANITAS CAFE

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 a Civil Right - Other Civil Right case was filed by ANTHONY NAVARRO against JUANITAS CAFE in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0198

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVARRO ANTHONY

Defendants

JUANITAS CAFE

BARRIENTOS OSCAR

BROADWAY LUXURY INVESTMENTS LLC

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/22/2018: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/28/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/28/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service

2/28/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/28/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

3/7/2018: Request for Dismissal

Summons - on Complaint

1/5/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/5/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/5/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/5/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/5/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Anthony Navarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Anthony Navarro (Plaintiff); As to: Broadway Luxury Investments LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 01/24/18; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Anthony Navarro (Plaintiff); As to: Oscar Barrientos (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/26/18; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Anthony Navarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Anthony Navarro (Plaintiff); As to: Juanitas Cafe (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/26/18; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Anthony Navarro (Plaintiff); As to: Broadway Luxury Investments LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Anthony Navarro on 01/05/2018, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to Broadway Luxury Investments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Anthony Navarro (Plaintiff); As to: Juanitas Cafe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Anthony Navarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Anthony Navarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

nnnnn

ATTORNEY OR PARTY WITHOUT ATTORNEY (Name, State Bar number, and address): TED S. SHIN, ESQ. (SBN: 253417 LAW OFFICE OF TED S. SHIN

POS-010

888 PROSPECT STREET

SAN DIEGO, CA 92037 Counto af Las Anoeles TELEPHONE NO.: (858) 560-8871 FAX NO. (Optional): (858) 560-8971, AL ADbRess (optons: BOARDWALKLAWFIRM@GMAIL.COM 2018 AtToRNEY FOR (Name): ANTHONY NAVARRO SherriR. Car Ter, KXecunve Uy jyopsy; - SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF L OS ANGELES By vlerk of Couyt streeTAbDRESS: 111 NORTH HILL STREET » Deputy MAILING ADDRESS: SAME Judi Lara

cmyanpzecooe: LOS ANGELES, CA 90012 srancHNaME: STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER: NAVARRO DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT: JUANITAS CAFE, et al

18STLCO00198

. ‘ Ref. No. or File No.: .

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

(Separate proof of service is required for each party served.)

1. Atthe time of service | was at least 18 yearsparty to this action. 2. | served copies of:

a. summons

complaint Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) package Civil Case Cover Sheet (served in complex cases only)

~ o Qe 0 T