Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2020 at 00:58:56 (UTC).

ANT RE AND ACQUISITIONS PARTNERS, LLC VS HIGH QUALITY INVESTMENTS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 ANT RE AND ACQUISITIONS PARTNERS, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HIGH QUALITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1605

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANT RE AND ACQUISITIONS PARTNERS LLC

Defendants

REALTY ONE GROUP SYNERGY

HIGH QUALITY INVESTMENTS LLC

REALTY ONE GROUP SYNERGY DBA REALTY ONE GROUP SYNERGY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBAGI ZEIN E JR

Defendant Attorneys

NEAVEL KELLY

CARNIE DAVID A

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/09/2020

3/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/09/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/2/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/24/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal Not Entered

5/24/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal Not Entered

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/27/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/26/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/31/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/6/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

12/4/2018: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

12/6/2018: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) and Summons

10/26/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) and Summons

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/29/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint

9/10/2018: Complaint

Summons - on Complaint

9/10/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/10/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/10/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/09/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Ant Re and Acquisitions Partners, LLC on 09/10/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 581(b)(3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 03/09/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal FILED NOT ENTERED: Name Extension: FILED NOT ENTERED; As To Parties changed from High Quality Investments, LLC (Defendant) to High Quality Investments, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Ant Re and Acquisitions Partners, LLC on 09/10/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Ant Re and Acquisitions Partners, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:1698674 resulted in empty message

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Ant Re and Acquisitions Partners, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: High Quality Investments, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Not Entered: Name Extension: Not Entered; As To Parties changed from High Quality Investments, LLC (Defendant), Realty One Group Synergy (Defendant) to ANGEL & PATTY, INC. Erroneously Sued As Realty One Group Synergy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Ant Re and Acquisitions Partners, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: High Quality Investments, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/11/18; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Ant Re and Acquisitions Partners, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: High Quality Investments, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/18/18; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) and Summons; Filed by: Ant Re and Acquisitions Partners, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ant Re and Acquisitions Partners, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: High Quality Investments, LLC (Defendant); Realty One Group Synergy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ant Re and Acquisitions Partners, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBAGI ZEIN E