This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2019 at 05:55:15 (UTC).

ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC VS MICHELLE MARGARET VASQUEZ

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against MICHELLE MARGARET VASQUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8998

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC

Defendant

VASQUEZ MICHELLE MARGARET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN MARC

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service;) of 11/27/2019

11/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service;) of 11/27/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service;)

11/27/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service;)

Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

11/25/2019: Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

Answer - Answer

11/22/2019: Answer - Answer

Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

10/30/2019: Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

10/22/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Notice of Rejection - Order To Post Unlawful Detainer - Notice of Rejection - Order To Post Unlawful Detainer

10/17/2019: Notice of Rejection - Order To Post Unlawful Detainer - Notice of Rejection - Order To Post Unlawful Detainer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection - Order To Post Unlawful Detainer]

10/17/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection - Order To Post Unlawful Detainer]

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

9/19/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ( Michelle Margaret Vasquez )

9/19/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ( Michelle Margaret Vasquez )

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/18/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

9/18/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/18/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/18/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/11/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Trial Setting or Dismissal for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute scheduled for 12/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Anjac Fashion Buildings LLC on 09/18/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Anjac Fashion Buildings LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Anjac Fashion Buildings LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Michelle Margaret Vasquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Trial Setting or Dismissal for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute scheduled for 12/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service;) of 11/27/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office updated: Result Date to 11/27/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by: Anjac Fashion Buildings LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Michelle Margaret Vasquez (Defendant); Mailing Date: 10/30/2019; Service Cost: 29.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Michelle Margaret Vasquez (Defendant); As to: Anjac Fashion Buildings LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Filed by: Anjac Fashion Buildings LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Michelle Margaret Vasquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post - Rejected; Submitted by: Anjac Fashion Buildings LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Michelle Margaret Vasquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence - Rejected; Submitted by: Anjac Fashion Buildings LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Michelle Margaret Vasquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Anjac Fashion Buildings LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Michelle Margaret Vasquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Anjac Fashion Buildings LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Michelle Margaret Vasquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Anjac Fashion Buildings LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Michelle Margaret Vasquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gail Killefer in Department 97 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC is a litigant