This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 01:39:56 (UTC).

ANI HOVSEPIAN VS MARCO BARRANTES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2018 ANI HOVSEPIAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARCO BARRANTES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2082

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOVSEPIAN ANI

Defendants

LA LOMA DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

BARRANTES MARCO

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/27/2018

7/27/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/27/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/27/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/27/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/27/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/30/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/17/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/27/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2018 at 11:00 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 07/27/2018; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ani Hovsepian on 05/17/2018 as follows: Defendants La Loma Development Company; Marco Barrantes do not owe the plaintiff Ani Hovsepian any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: Judgment is in favor of both defendants. defendant #1 is the designated person to be served for corporate defendant #2. Defendant #1 stipulated that service is good as to corporate defendant #2. Trial went forward as to both defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion was rescheduled to 07/27/2018 11:00 AM at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 07/27/2018 08:30 AM at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/27/2018 08:30 AM at Department R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Ani Hovsepian (Plaintiff); As to: Marco Barrantes (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/29/2018; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ani Hovsepian (Plaintiff); As to: Marco Barrantes (Defendant); La Loma Development Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/27/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA LOMA DEVELOPMENT COMPANY INC. is a litigant