This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/11/2018 at 10:14:18 (UTC).

ANH THI NGUYEN, ET AL. VS KHANH VUONG

Case Summary

On 07/05/2017 ANH THI NGUYEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KHANH VUONG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5235

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NGUYEN ANH THI

Alhambra, CA 91801

LAM HAN

Alhambra, CA 91801

Defendant

VUONG KHANH

Rosemead, CA 91770

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/13/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2018

2/13/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/13/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/12/2017

12/12/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/12/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

12/12/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/28/2017

9/28/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/28/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/28/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/18/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/18/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Rejection]

9/19/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Rejection]

Notice of Rejection

9/19/2017: Notice of Rejection

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) (end date)

8/17/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) (end date)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

8/17/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/5/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/5/2017: Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

7/5/2017: Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 02/13/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Anh Thi Nguyen, et al. on 07/05/2017 as follows: Defendant Khanh Vuong does not owe the plaintiffs Anh Thi Nguyen; Han Lam any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: Plaintiff failed to meet its burden of proof.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/12/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/13/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/28/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Anh Thi Nguyen (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170706E9352 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1170706E9352 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Anh Thi Nguyen (Plaintiff); Han Lam (Plaintiff); As to: Khanh Vuong (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less