This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2021 at 04:52:10 (UTC).

ANGINE ABEDIAN, ET AL. VS KELLY GENEVIEVE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 ANGINE ABEDIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KELLY GENEVIEVE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5077

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ASADOURIAN BENET

ABEDIAN ANGINE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

GENEVIEVE KELLY

KIM NAM KYU

KIM HYUNSUNG

ABEDIAN ANGINE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KIM NAM KYU

KIM HYUNSUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

BERNSTEIN BARRY S.

TOPCHYAN ARUTYUN

BAILEY JUDI A

GIMENEZ TERRY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GIMENEZ TERRY

Cross Defendant Attorney

WOOD CARY L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/20/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

1/8/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

1/8/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

1/8/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Answer - Answer

12/10/2020: Answer - Answer

Amended Cross-Complaint - Amended Cross-Complaint (1st)

11/3/2020: Amended Cross-Complaint - Amended Cross-Complaint (1st)

Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint

11/3/2020: Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/5/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer - Answer

10/15/2020: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

10/15/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/15/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

10/15/2020: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/1/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer - Answer

9/25/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/25/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

9/25/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/31/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

6/19/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • Hearing06/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • Hearing12/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Hyunsung Kim (Defendant); Nam Kyu Kim (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Angine Abedian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Benet Asadourian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Benita Asadourian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Angine Abedian (Cross-Defendant); As to: Nam Kyu Kim (Cross-Complainant); Hyunsung Kim (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 12/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Benita Asadourian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nam Kyu Kim (Cross-Complainant); Hyunsung Kim (Cross-Complainant); As to: Angine Abedian (Cross-Defendant); Angine Abedian (Cross-Defendant); Kelly Genevieve (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: Angine Abedian (Plaintiff); Benita Asadourian (Plaintiff); Benet Asadourian (Plaintiff); As to: Benita Asadourian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Benita Asadourian (Plaintiff),Benet Asadourian (Plaintiff),Angine Abedian (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Angine Abedian (Plaintiff),Benet Asadourian (Plaintiff),Benita Asadourian (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Angine Abedian (Plaintiff); Benita Asadourian (Plaintiff); Benet Asadourian (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly Genevieve (Defendant); Hyunsung Kim (Defendant); Nam Kyu Kim (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Angine Abedian (Plaintiff); Benita Asadourian (Plaintiff); Benet Asadourian (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly Genevieve (Defendant); Hyunsung Kim (Defendant); Nam Kyu Kim (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIMENEZ TERRY L. ESQ.