This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/02/2021 at 06:06:06 (UTC).

ANGIE SIEW-HONG NG, ET AL. VS ZHA YU

Case Summary

On 04/19/2019 ANGIE SIEW-HONG NG filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ZHA YU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3887

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEO CAMMIE

NG ANGIE SIEW-HONG

Defendant

YU ZHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

GARCIA ANTHONY R

 

Court Documents

Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: MOTION TO DEEM COMPLAINT TIMELY FILED

11/27/2019: Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: MOTION TO DEEM COMPLAINT TIMELY FILED

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Deem Complaint Timely Fil...)

2/3/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Deem Complaint Timely Fil...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial) of 10/06/2020

10/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial) of 10/06/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial)

10/6/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/16/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/15/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/15/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/11/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/11/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/24/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

7/12/2019: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

7/12/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

4/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • Hearing07/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Hearing04/05/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion - Other Motion to Deem Complaint Timely Filed scheduled for 04/05/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 07/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Deem Complaint Timely Fil...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Deem Complaint Timely Filed scheduled for 02/03/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/05/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 02/03/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 07/20/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 02/03/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial) of 10/06/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketMotion re: MOTION TO DEEM COMPLAINT TIMELY FILED; Filed by: ANGIE SIEW-HONG NG (Plaintiff); As to: ANGIE SIEW-HONG NG (Plaintiff); ZHA YU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: ANGIE SIEW-HONG NG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: ANGIE SIEW-HONG NG (Plaintiff); As to: ANGIE SIEW-HONG NG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ANGIE SIEW-HONG NG (Plaintiff); As to: CAMMIE NEO (Plaintiff); ZHA YU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ANGIE SIEW-HONG NG (Plaintiff); CAMMIE NEO (Plaintiff); As to: CAMMIE NEO (Plaintiff); ZHA YU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ANGIE SIEW-HONG NG (Plaintiff); CAMMIE NEO (Plaintiff); As to: CAMMIE NEO (Plaintiff); ZHA YU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC03887    Hearing Date: February 03, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Wed., February 3, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Ng, et al. v. Yu COMP. FILED: 04-19-19

CASE NUMBER: 19STLC03887 DEFAULT: 09-16-20

NOTICE: N/A (¿ in default) TRIAL DATE: NONE

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO DEEM COMPLAINT TIMELY FILED

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Angie Siew-Hong Ng

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO DEEM COMPLAINT TIMELY FILED

(CCP § ??)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Angie Siew-Hong Ng’s Motion to Deem Complaint Timely Filed due to Clerk’s Office Error is CONTINUED TO APRIL 5, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Plaintiff must file supplemental papers addressing the deficiencies noted herein. Failure to do so may result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.

SERVICE:

[ ] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) N/A

[ ] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) N/A

[ ] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) N/A

OPPOSITION: None filed as of February 1, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of February 1, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On April 19, 2019, Plaintiff Angie Siew-Hong Ng (“Ng”) and Cammie Neo (“Neo”) (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) filed an action for general negligence and motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Zha Yu (“Defendant”).

Plaintiff Ng filed the instant Motion to Deem Complaint Timely Filed (the “Motion”) on November 27, 2019. No opposition was filed.

Default was entered against Defendant on September 16, 2020.

As an initial matter, the Court notes Plaintiff has not satisfied the requirements of California Rules of Court, rule 3.1112, which require that motions consist of a notice of hearing, the motion itself, and a memorandum in support of the motion. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1112, subd. (a).) Plaintiff’s Motion, however, is not based on any legal authority. “The memorandum must contain a statement of facts, a concise statement of the law, evidence and arguments relied on, and a discussion of the statutes, cases, and textbooks cited in support of the position advanced.” (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1113, subd. (b).) Without citation to legal authority, the Court has no basis on which to grant relief.

Thus, Plaintiff is ordered to file supplemental papers remedying this issue.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Angie Siew-Hong Ng’s Motion to Deem Complaint Timely Filed due to Clerk’s Office Error is CONTINUED TO APRIL 5, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Plaintiff must file supplemental papers addressing the deficiencies noted herein. Failure to do so may result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA ANTHONY R