This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2019 at 01:18:30 (UTC).

ANGIE ESQUIVEL, ET AL. VS MARTIN BARBOZA

Case Summary

On 08/20/2018 ANGIE ESQUIVEL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARTIN BARBOZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3992

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESQUIVEL ANGIE

Downey, CA 90241

FACCHETTI ANDREA

Downey, CA 90241

Defendant

BARBOZA MARTIN

Downey, CA 90240

 

Court Documents

Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

5/13/2019: Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

5/13/2019: Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

4/2/2019: Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/7/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

3/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]

3/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]

Response to Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) - Response to Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

3/20/2019: Response to Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) - Response to Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

3/21/2019: Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

1/28/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/28/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/28/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/28/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/20/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 11/20/2018

11/20/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 11/20/2018

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/20/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (3992Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/20/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

9/20/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (3992Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/20/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

9/20/2018: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

9/20/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (3992Ruling on Submitted Matter)

9/20/2018: Minute Order - (3992Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/20/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketJudgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: ANGIE ESQUIVEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketJudgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: ANDREA FACCHETTI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 05/13/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 05/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 05/13/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketRequest to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: MARTIN BARBOZA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Pay Judgment to Court: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff ANGIE ESQUIVEL and Plaintiff ANDREA FACCHETTI against Defendant MARTIN BARBOZA on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by ANGIE ESQUIVEL, et al. on 08/20/2018 for the principal amount of $700.00 for a total of $700.00.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $30.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant MARTIN BARBOZA. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: ANGIE ESQUIVEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: ANGIE ESQUIVEL (Plaintiff); ANDREA FACCHETTI (Plaintiff); As to: MARTIN BARBOZA (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ANGIE ESQUIVEL (Plaintiff); ANDREA FACCHETTI (Plaintiff); As to: MARTIN BARBOZA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: ANGIE ESQUIVEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: ANGIE ESQUIVEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: ANDREA FACCHETTI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: ANDREA FACCHETTI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less