This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2020 at 07:41:52 (UTC).

ANGEL GONZALES VS LETICIA VASQUEZ

Case Summary

On 10/26/2018 ANGEL GONZALES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LETICIA VASQUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3207

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GONZALES ANGEL

ROES 30 TO 40

SILVA COMMUNICATIONS

SILVA YVETTE

Defendant

VASQUEZ LETICIA DBA VASQUEZ FOR WATER BOARD 2016

Cross Plaintiff

VASQUEZ LETICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

OLIVO EDUARDO

Attorney at Olivo & Associates

13191 Crossroads Pkwy N Ste 220

City Of Industry, CA 91746

BUCCAT JASON

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

WILSON RONALD NOLAN

Attorney at Ronald N Wilson & Associates

3415 S Sepulveda Blvd Ste 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90034

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

11/14/2019: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF LETICIA VASQUEZ IN SUPPORT OF CROSS COMPLAINANTS APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

8/23/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF LETICIA VASQUEZ IN SUPPORT OF CROSS COMPLAINANTS APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Application (name extension) - Application CROSS COMPLAINANT LETICIA VASQUEZS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARAT

8/23/2019: Application (name extension) - Application CROSS COMPLAINANT LETICIA VASQUEZS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARAT

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application for an Order for Publication of Summons on Cross Complaint

8/23/2019: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application for an Order for Publication of Summons on Cross Complaint

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition DEFENDANT/CROSS COMPLAINANT LETICIA VASQUEZS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS OF $4,987.50 AGAINST JASON BUCCAT AND/OR PLAINT

9/19/2019: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition DEFENDANT/CROSS COMPLAINANT LETICIA VASQUEZS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS OF $4,987.50 AGAINST JASON BUCCAT AND/OR PLAINT

Reply (name extension) - Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Compel

9/30/2019: Reply (name extension) - Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Compel

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Publication re: Yvette

10/1/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Publication re: Yvette

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)

10/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel)

4/30/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel) of 04/30/2019

4/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel) of 04/30/2019

Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - Supplemental Declaration Reply Declaration of Leticia Vasquez

4/18/2019: Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - Supplemental Declaration Reply Declaration of Leticia Vasquez

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

4/22/2019: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order Notice of Motion and Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel

4/8/2019: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order Notice of Motion and Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Ronald N. Wilson

4/8/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Ronald N. Wilson

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/8/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

1/31/2019: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/26/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • Hearing10/29/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Hearing04/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Angel Gonzales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses: Filed By: Angel Gonzales (Cross-Defendant); Result: Granted in Part; Result Date: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 10/08/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 10/08/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application CROSS COMPLAINANT LETICIA VASQUEZ?S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATIONS OF RONALD N. WILSON & LETICIA VASQUEZ; PROPOSED ORDER: Result Date: 10/01/2019; As To Parties changed from Yvette Silva (Cross-Defendant) to Yvette Silva (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration DECLARATION OF RONALD N. WILSON IN SUPPORT OF CROSS COMPLAINANT LETICIA VASQUEZ?S APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT: Result Date: 10/01/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration DECLARATION OF LETICIA VASQUEZ IN SUPPORT OF CROSS COMPLAINANT?S APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT: Result Date: 10/01/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Publication re: Yvette; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Leticia Vasquez (Cross-Complainant); Leticia Vasquez (Defendant); As to: Angel Gonzales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: Leticia Vasquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Angel Gonzales (Plaintiff); As to: Leticia Vasquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Angel Gonzales (Plaintiff); As to: Leticia Vasquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Angel Gonzales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC13207    Hearing Date: February 25, 2020    Dept: 26

Gonzalez v. Vasquez, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant / Cross-Complainant Leticia Vasquez’s Motion To Compel Further Responses To Request For Production Of Documents; Request For Monetary Sanctions is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. Based on the relief sought in the Cross-Complaint, this case is reclassified as an unlimited civil case and transferred to the Reclassification/Transfer Desk for collection of fees and reassignment of the case to an Independent Calendar Court. Defendant / Cross-Complainant is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days.

ANALYSIS:

On October 26, 2019, Plaintiff Angel Gonzalez (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for breach of oral contract against Defendant Leticia Vasquez (“Defendant”). On January 31, 2019, Defendant filed a Cross-Complaint for breach of contract, negligence, fraud and common counts. The Cross-Complaint specifically seeks damages of $30,000.00. (Cross-Compl., ¶¶13, 30.)

As a limited jurisdiction court, this Court lacks jurisdiction to grant damages in excess of $25,000.00. (See Code Civ. Proc., §§ 85, 86, subd. (a).) Based on the relief sought, this case is reclassified as an unlimited civil case and transferred to the Reclassification/Transfer Desk for collection of fees and reassignment of the case to an Independent Calendar Court. Defendant / Cross-Complainant is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days.

Court clerk to give notice.