This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2018 at 02:36:20 (UTC).

ANDREW FORSYTHE VS ERIN BOUNDS

Case Summary

On 08/16/2016 ANDREW FORSYTHE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ERIN BOUNDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2234

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORSYTHE ANDREW

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Defendant

BOUNDS ERIN

Los Angeles, CA 90016

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

10/13/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/14/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/13/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 10/13/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

10/13/2016: Minute Order of 10/13/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/16/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

RETURNED MAIL - (notice of entry of judgment)

11/17/2016: RETURNED MAIL - (notice of entry of judgment)

Minute Order of 11/02/2016

11/2/2016: Minute Order of 11/02/2016

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - (Amended)

11/2/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - (Amended)

Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

11/2/2016: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/13/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL (notice of entry of judgment); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 11/02/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Andrew Forsythe (Plaintiff); As to: Erin Bounds (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 10/13/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Updated -- Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 10/13/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets: Status Date changed from 10/13/2016 to 10/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Status Date changed from 10/12/2016 to 10/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2016
  • Updated -- Judgment amended on 10/13/2016 ; Status Date changed from 10/12/2016 to 10/13/2016 ; Status changed from Entered to Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 10/13/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Andrew Forsythe against Defendant Erin Bounds on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Andrew Forsythe on 08/16/2016 for the principal amount of $1,400.00 and costs of $0.00 for a total of $1,400.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Status Date changed from 10/14/2016 to 10/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Andrew Forsythe (Plaintiff); As to: Erin Bounds (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0002973 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.