Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2021 at 08:47:38 (UTC).

ANDREA OCAMPO VS DORTHY LAMOUR NEAL

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 ANDREA OCAMPO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DORTHY LAMOUR NEAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1951

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCAMPO ANDREA

Defendant

NEAL DOROTHY LAMOUR

 

Court Documents

Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

4/7/2021: Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

Other - (name extension) - Other - Exhibits Receipt

12/22/2020: Other - (name extension) - Other - Exhibits Receipt

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/27/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/22/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

12/22/2020: Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/22/2020

12/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/22/2020

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/22/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

12/22/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Attachment - Attachment

7/23/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

7/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/24/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Andrea Ocampo on 06/24/2020 as follows: Defendant Dorothy Lamour Neal does not owe the plaintiff Andrea Ocampo any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketOther - Exhibits Receipt; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketReceipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 12/22/2020; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/22/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Andrea Ocampo (Plaintiff); As to: Dorothy Lamour Neal (Defendant); Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Dorothy Lamour Neal (Defendant): First Name changed from Dorthy to Dorothy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Dorthy Lamour Neal (Defendant) to Dorthy Lamour Neal (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Dorthy Lamour Neal (Defendant) to Dorthy Lamour Neal (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Andrea Ocampo (Plaintiff); As to: Dorthy Lamour Neal (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less