Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 19:24:06 (UTC).

ANDERSON REHABILITATION, INC. VS ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/25/2018 ANDERSON REHABILITATION, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0431

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSON REHABILITATION INC.

1808 Stanford Ave.,

Redondo Beach, CA 90278

Defendant

ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER INC. A CORPORATION

600 N. Central Ave, Apt #252,

Glendale, CA 91203

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/18/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/18/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/18/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/18/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/18/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/18/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/13/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

1/25/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/25/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1/25/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 05/18/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Anderson Rehabilitation, Inc. against Defendant ERG Home Health Provider, Inc., a corporation on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Anderson Rehabilitation, Inc. on 01/25/2018 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $100.00 for a total of $5,100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/18/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Anderson Rehabilitation, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: ERG Home Health Provider, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Anderson Rehabilitation, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: ERG Home Health Provider, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANDERSON REHABILITATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER INC. is a litigant