Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2019 at 00:43:23 (UTC).

ANDERSON REHABILITATION, INC. VS ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER, INC

Case Summary

On 12/27/2018 ANDERSON REHABILITATION, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5343

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSON REHABILITATION INC.

1808 Stanford Ave.

Redondo Beach, CA 90278

Defendant

ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER INC

535 N. Brand Blvd, # 510

Glendale, CA 91203

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Karin Anderson for Anderson Rehabilitation, Inc.

2/1/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Karin Anderson for Anderson Rehabilitation, Inc.

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) William Brinkley for

2/1/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) William Brinkley for

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/01/2019

2/1/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/01/2019

Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

2/1/2019: Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/1/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/7/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/27/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

12/27/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

12/27/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Karin Anderson for Anderson Rehabilitation, Inc. Filed by: Anderson Rehabilitation, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) William Brinkley for; Filed by: ERG Home Health Provider, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/01/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/01/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 02/01/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Anderson Rehabilitation, Inc. on 12/27/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Anderson Rehabilitation, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: ERG Home Health Provider, Inc (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/01/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Anderson Rehabilitation, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: ERG Home Health Provider, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER INC. is a litigant