Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 04:57:32 (UTC).

ANATOLIY DUDCHENKO VS ASMIK ASATRYAN

Case Summary

On 05/15/2017 ANATOLIY DUDCHENKO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ASMIK ASATRYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3689

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUDCHENKO ANATOLIY

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Defendant

ASATRYAN ASMIK

Los Angeles, CA 90027

 

Court Documents

Unknown

4/25/2018: Unknown

Unknown

12/8/2017: Unknown

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/11/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/7/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 07/11/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/11/2017: Minute Order of 07/11/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/11/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/11/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Rejection

7/6/2017: Notice of Rejection

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/16/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 04/27/2018 ; Status Date changed from 07/11/2017 to 04/27/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 04/27/2018 ; Status Date changed from 04/27/2018 to 04/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Anatoliy Dudchenko (Plaintiff); As to: Asmik Asatryan (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Asmik Asatryan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/11/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/11/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/11/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Anatoliy Dudchenko against Defendant Asmik Asatryan on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Anatoliy Dudchenko on 05/15/2017 for the principal amount of $1,928.20 and costs of $85.00 for a total of $2,013.20.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Anatoliy Dudchenko (Plaintiff); As to: Asmik Asatryan (Defendant); Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/25/17

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2017
  • Payment: Facsimile Filing Verification Fee - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Amount: $4.50 Receipt: IW-2017-0015101 (Credit Card)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Anatoliy Dudchenko (Plaintiff); As to: Asmik Asatryan (Defendant); Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/25/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/11/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0012997 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Invoice: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Fee: $8.25; Payment: 8.25 Receipt: IW-2017-0012997 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Invoice: Facsimile Filing Verification Fee - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Fee: $4.50; Payment: 4.50 Receipt: IW-2017-0012997 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Status Date changed from 05/15/2017 to 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Anatoliy Dudchenko (Plaintiff); As to: Asmik Asatryan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less