Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2019 at 00:06:53 (UTC).

ANASTASIA BARRETT VS HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 ANASTASIA BARRETT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY A. SANTANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5090

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RAY A. SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRETT ANASTASIA

Defendant

HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC

 

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

6/28/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/30/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/28/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/28/2019

8/28/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/28/2019

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

6/28/2019: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/28/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/26/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

4/26/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4/26/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/28/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Anastasia Barrett on 04/26/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 08/28/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Anastasia Barrett (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Real Estate Management Group, Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/26/19; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Anastasia Barrett (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Anastasia Barrett (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Real Estate Management Group, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC. is a litigant