This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2017 at 10:39:21 (UTC).

ANANIAN VARTENIE VS UNDERWRITERS SURETY, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/11/2017 ANANIAN VARTENIE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNDERWRITERS SURETY, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRDAUS F. DORDI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7166

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

FIRDAUS F. DORDI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARTENIE ANANIAN

Defendant

UNDERWRITERS SURETY INC.

Not Classified By Court

JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES INC

 

Court Documents

Unknown

10/18/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

10/18/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/18/2017

10/18/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/18/2017

Unknown

8/22/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/18/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department Z Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 12/18/2017 08:30 AM at 12/18/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Judicial Legal Services Inc (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Updated -- Request for Refund / Order: Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ANANIAN VARTENIE (Plaintiff); As to: UNDERWRITERS SURETY, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Firdaus F. Dordi in Department Z Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant