This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 04:25:37 (UTC).

AMUSEMENT INDUSTRY C-VII LLC VS SUKKAR, OUSSAMA

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 AMUSEMENT INDUSTRY C-VII LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against SUKKAR, OUSSAMA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1478

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMUSEMENT INDUSTRY C-VII LLC

Defendant

SUKKAR OUSSAMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIBRATY MICHAEL O. ESQ

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/14/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

8/25/2017: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession

9/1/2017: Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of (name extension) - Possession- returned via runner service

9/5/2017: Writ of (name extension) - Possession- returned via runner service

Writ - Return

9/29/2017: Writ - Return

Request for Dismissal

1/24/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/24/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

1/24/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

1/24/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

2/15/2018: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

4/12/2018: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Proof of Service by Posting

7/31/2017: Proof of Service by Posting

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (AMUSEMENT INDUSTRY C-VII LLC) against Defendant (SUKKAR, OUSSAMA) on the Complaint filed by (AMUSEMENT INDUSTRY C-VII LLC) on 06/20/2017 for the principal amount of $2,337.89, damages of $9,194.56, attorney fees of $514.47, costs of $455.00, and other $-4,458.00 for a total of $8,043.92.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (AMUSEMENT INDUSTRY C-VII LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1 - 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • On the Complaint filed by (AMUSEMENT INDUSTRY C-VII LLC) on 06/20/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1 - 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (AMUSEMENT INDUSTRY C-VII LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: OUSSAMA SUKKAR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Default entered as to OUSSAMA SUKKAR; On the Complaint filed by (AMUSEMENT INDUSTRY C-VII LLC) on 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (AMUSEMENT INDUSTRY C-VII LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (AMUSEMENT INDUSTRY C-VII LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Writ - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 145.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2017
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • ORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CORR DESK RE: ORDER TO POST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CORR DESK RE: MISC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN POM535751024. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 12/22/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT EAG . .

    Read MoreRead Less