This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2019 at 19:41:52 (UTC).

AMIR DEVELOPMENT COMPANY VS GARSON SILVERS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2018 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by AMIR DEVELOPMENT COMPANY against GARSON SILVERS, ET AL in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0644

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

MARK A. YOUNG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMIR DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

Defendants

ADAMS HOPE

SILVERS GARSON

 

Court Documents

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

4/16/2018: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (GARSON SILVERS)

4/6/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (GARSON SILVERS)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Property Owner/Landlord Notice of Hearing Re Failure to File Proof of Service

4/6/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Notice of Hearing Re Failure to File Proof of Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/20/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

4/23/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Complaint

4/6/2018: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (HOPE ADAMS)

4/6/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (HOPE ADAMS)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/2/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/6/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

4/6/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Application for Writ of Possession

5/3/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

Summons - on Complaint

4/6/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Judgment Unlawful Detainer

5/3/2018: Judgment Unlawful Detainer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/20/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2018
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff AMIR DEVELOPMENT COMPANY against Defendant GARSON SILVERS and Defendant HOPE ADAMS on the Complaint filed by AMIR DEVELOPMENT COMPANY on 04/06/2018 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 10600 WILSHIRE BLVD # 215, Los Angeles, CA 90024 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: AMIR DEVELOPMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: AMIR DEVELOPMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Default entered as to unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by AMIR DEVELOPMENT COMPANY on 04/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 04/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: AMIR DEVELOPMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GARSON SILVERS (Defendant); Service Date: 04/06/18; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: AMIR DEVELOPMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: HOPE ADAMS (Defendant); Service Date: 04/06/18; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2018
  • Updated -- Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial: Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by: AMIR DEVELOPMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by: AMIR DEVELOPMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GARSON SILVERS (Defendant); HOPE ADAMS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMIR DEVELOPMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Mark A. Young in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 04/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.