Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 08:14:22 (UTC).

AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS JEANETTE KHAN

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against JEANETTE KHAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6477

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

KHAN JEANETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILKS ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

LOURO JENNY R

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

10/7/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

9/8/2020: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/3/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

8/3/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/3/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2023
  • Hearing08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • Hearing01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jeanette Khan (Defendant); As to: Amica Mutual insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Amica Mutual insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jeanette Khan (Defendant); Service Date: 09/23/2020; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Amica Mutual insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jeanette Khan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Amica Mutual insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jeanette Khan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Amica Mutual insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jeanette Khan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Amica Mutual insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jeanette Khan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amica Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILKS ROBERT