This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 01:00:38 (UTC).

AMERICA'S SECURITY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS LIMITLESS MARKETING, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/21/2018 AMERICA'S SECURITY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against LIMITLESS MARKETING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARILYN M MORDETZKY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3888

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARILYN M MORDETZKY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICA'S SECURITY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

LIMITLESS MARKETING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILDERMUTH MICHAEL SHANE

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO 1167.1 CCP - ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO 1167.1 CCP

10/30/2018: ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO 1167.1 CCP - ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO 1167.1 CCP

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

8/22/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Limitless Marketing, Inc.)

8/22/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Limitless Marketing, Inc.)

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

8/21/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint

8/21/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/21/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

8/21/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/21/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO 1167.1 CCP; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by America's Security, a California corporation on 08/21/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to 1167.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department H Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 10/30/2018 08:30 AM at Civil Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department H - Hon. Emily Garcia Uhrig; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 08/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: America's Security, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Limitless Marketing, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: America's Security, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- 10/30/2018 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service: Location changed from Civil Clerk's Office to Department H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Marilyn M Mordetzky in Department H Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Civil Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICA'S SECURITY A CA. CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILDERMUTH, MICHAEL S