This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/29/2018 at 08:49:23 (UTC).

AMERICA'S PRIME BEEF, INC. VS HARRIS RANCH BEEF COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/31/2017 AMERICA'S PRIME BEEF, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARRIS RANCH BEEF COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0578

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICA'S PRIME BEEF INC.

Defendant

HARRIS RANCH BEEF COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Unknown

10/31/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/15/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/29/2017

12/29/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/29/2017

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/29/2017

12/29/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/29/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

12/29/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

12/29/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/29/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/09/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: America's Prime Beef, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/29/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion was rescheduled to 04/26/2018 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 12/29/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Harris Ranch Beef Company (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: America's Prime Beef, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Harris Ranch Beef Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less