This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 14:17:28 (UTC).

AMERICA'S INSURANCE COMPANY VS MELIKIAN, AGHASI

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 AMERICA'S INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MELIKIAN, AGHASI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4731

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICA'S INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

MELIKIAN AGHASI

MELIKIAN KARAPET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF TODD F. HAINES

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/3/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

2/5/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Judgment

2/5/2018: Judgment

Judgment

2/5/2018: Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - re: memorandum of pre-judgment interest

2/5/2018: Declaration (name extension) - re: memorandum of pre-judgment interest

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/11/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - 585

2/5/2018: Declaration (name extension) - 585

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/31/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

12/13/2017: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Proof of Personal Service

7/28/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

2/5/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/11/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment; Issued by: Clerk; As to: KARAPET MELIKIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: AMERICA'S INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by AMERICA'S INSURANCE COMPANY on 04/13/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: AMERICA'S INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Docket; On the Complaint filed by AMERICA'S INSURANCE COMPANY on 04/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: AMERICA'S INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: AGHASI MELIKIAN (Defendant); KARAPET MELIKIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to AGHASI MELIKIAN; KARAPET MELIKIAN; On the Complaint filed by AMERICA'S INSURANCE COMPANY on 04/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AMERICA'S INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: AGHASI MELIKIAN (Defendant); Service Date: 07/11/17; Service Cost: 101.61; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/15/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 04/13/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - INSURANCE COVERAGE Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less